Search results
Results From The WOW.Com Content Network
Ministry of Health. Minister of Health. Ministry of Water Supply. Minister of Water Supply. Ministry of Agriculture. Minister of Agriculture. Ministry of Wildlife and Forest Resources Conservation. Minister of Wildlife and Forest Resources Conservation. Ministry of Justice, Prisons Affairs and Constitutional Reforms.
In Sri Lanka, the Cabinet of Ministers is the council of senior ministers responsible and answerable to the Parliament of Sri Lanka. The President is a member of the cabinet and its head. [1] The Dissanayake cabinet is the incumbent central government of Sri Lanka led by President Anura Kumara Dissanayake.
The Dissanayake cabinet is the incumbent central government of Sri Lanka led by President Anura Kumara Dissanayake. ... Minister of Agriculture, Land, Livestock ...
t. e. In the Sri Lankan Government, ministers are members of Parliament who hold appointments from the President to perform certain functions of government. This includes formulating and implementing policies and heading government ministries. Ministers collectively make up the executive branch of the Government of Sri Lanka.
The Government of Sri Lanka (GoSL) (Sinhala: ශ්රී ලංකා රජය, romanized: Śrī Lankā Rajaya; Tamil: இலங்கை அரசாங்கம்) is a Semi-presidential republic determined by the Sri Lankan Constitution. It administers the island from both its commercial capital of Colombo and the administrative ...
Sri Lanka Freedom Party: 8 Dudley Senanayake cabinet III: 25 March 1965: 29 May 1970: Dudley Senanayake: United National Party: 9 Sirimavo Bandaranaike cabinet II: 29 May 1970: 23 July 1977: Sirimavo Bandaranaike: Sri Lanka Freedom Party: 10 Jayewardene cabinet I: 23 July 1977: 7 September 1978: William Gopallawa (1972–1978) J. R. Jayewardene ...
List of prime ministers of Sri Lanka. Top left: D. S. Senanayake became the first prime minister of Ceylon in 1947. Top right: Sirimavo Bandaranaike was the first female prime minister of Ceylon and also its longest-serving prime minister, holding the office for over 17 years on three separate occasions. Bottom left: Ranasinghe Premadasa was ...
The Wickremesinghe cabinet was the central government of Sri Lanka led by President Ranil Wickremesinghe. It was formed in July 2022, following the resignation of Wickremesinghe's predecessor, Gotabaya Rajapaksa. It ended in September 2024 following Wickremesinghe's defeat at the 2024 Sri Lankan presidential election.